IL HB4846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0858
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0858
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a violation (rather than a second or subsequent violation) of a provision in the Code governing the use of an electronic communication device while operating a motor vehicle is an offense against traffic regulations governing the movement of vehicles. Removes a provision providing that a person who violates the governing provision shall be fined a maximum of $75 for a first offense, $100 for a second offense, $125 for a third offense, and $150 for a fourth or subsequent offense. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-ELECTRONIC DEVICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0858 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-015-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-610.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |