IL HB4792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a regional water treatment facility shall be certified by providing to the Department of Revenue proof of a valid facility number issued by the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency. Repeals a Section concerning applications for approval as a water treatment facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-WATER TREATMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520011-155Amended CodeCitation Text
3520011-160Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback