IL HB4737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to provide any child age 19 or younger who is still attending high school and not otherwise emancipated the same services and programs that are provided to any child under the age of 18 and on the same terms and conditions as those services or programs are provided to any child under the age of 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS SERVICES-KIDS 19&YOUNGER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205054eNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback