IL HB4689 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Modifies a Section concerning the adoption of federal rules applicable to grants and provides that specified provisions do not apply to for-profit subrecipients because for-profit subrecipients are not subject to the requirements of a specified provision of the Code of Federal Regulations. Provides that if a Program Audit Guide is not available, the State awarding agency must prepare a Program Audit Guide in accordance with the audit requirements of specified provisions of the Code of Federal Regulations. Requires the Governor's Office of Management and Budget to adopt supplemental rules pertaining to, among other subjects, specific conditions for individual recipients, including (rather than requiring) the use of a fiscal agent and additional corrective conditions. Applies provisions in the Code of Federal Regulations concerning federal agencies that make federal awards to non-federal entities to State grant-making agencies under the Act. Provides that the Grant Accountability and Transparency Unit shall be responsible for providing technical assistance and assuring the Administrative Code proposed by State grant agencies comply with the Act. Repeals the Section specifying a repeal date for the Act. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-ST AGENCY GRANT MAKING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-002
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30708100Repealed CodeCitation Text
3070820Amended CodeCitation Text
3070825Amended CodeCitation Text
3070845Amended CodeCitation Text
3070860Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback