IL HB4643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-15)
Status: Passed on August 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0897
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-15)
Status: Passed on August 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0897
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the limitation on determining a differential diagnosis shall not in any manner limit a physical therapist from establishing a relevant diagnosis. In the definition of "documented current and relevant diagnosis" and in provisions concerning disciplinary actions, removes language requiring a diagnosis to be substantiated by a physician, dentist, advanced practice registered nurse, physician assistant, or podiatric physician. Effective immediately.
Title
PHYSICAL THERAPY-DIAGNOSIS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0897 |
2018-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2018 |
2018-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 095-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-002-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 90 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 90 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |