IL HB4573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that any public agency may invest any public funds in obligations (currently, short term obligations) of corporations organized in the United States with assets exceeding $500,000,000 if such obligations mature not later than 3 years (currently, 270 days) from the date of purchase, in addition to other criteria. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC FUNDS-CORPORATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0752
2018-08-10HouseEffective Date August 10, 2018
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-009-000
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
302352Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback