IL HB4345 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0900
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0900
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that May 19 of each year is designated as "First Responder Mental Health Awareness Day", to be observed throughout the State as a day to honor firefighters, police officers, and other first responders who have lost their lives due to and suffer from post-traumatic stress disorder, depression, and other mental health issues.
Title
FIREFIGHTER MENTAL HEALTH DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0900 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |