IL HB4336 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a juvenile may be kept or detained in an authorized detention facility if the juvenile is 13 years of age or older (rather than 10 years of age or older). Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-AGE OF DETENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-720Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback