IL HB4332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that, for purposes of issuing an identification card with a veteran designation under the Act, the acceptable forms of proof an applicant may provide includes a Department of Defense form DD-2 (Retired), an identification card issued under the federal Veterans Identification Card Act of 2015, or a United States Department of Veterans Affairs summary of benefits letter. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes conforming changes in regards to a driver's license with a veteran designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ID CARD/DL-VETERAN DESIGNATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-15SenateRe-assigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Veterans Affairs
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153355Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-106Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback