IL HB4128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Electronics Recycling Act. Provides that a manufacturer or manufacturer clearinghouse acting in accordance with the Act when engaged in activities related to a manufacturer e-waste program shall not be subject to damages, liability, or scrutiny under federal antitrust law or the Illinois Antitrust Act. Makes corresponding changes in the Illinois Antitrust Act. Adds provisions concerning the allocation of financial responsibility for manufacturers participating in a manufacturer clearinghouse. Contains provisions requiring the Environmental Protection Agency to calculate the responsibility of participating manufacturers using a specified formula. Repeals provisions concerning the allocation of financial responsibilities among manufacturers and abolishes the Advisory Financial Responsibility Allocation Task Force. Adds provisions concerning manufacturer clearinghouses. Makes changes to provisions concerning the information that must be included on a manufacturer registration form. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSUMER ELECTRONICS RECYCLING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 151 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 151 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 151 | 1-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 151 | 1-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 151 | 1-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 151 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 151 | 1-84 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 151 | 1-84.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 151 | 1-87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4128&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4128.htm |