IL HB3144 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the provision of the Code that makes it an offense for a person who possesses or acquires a firearm and thereafter loses the firearm, or if the firearm is stolen from the person, to fail to report the loss or theft to the local law enforcement agency within 72 hours after obtaining knowledge of the loss or theft is a Class 4 felony for a third offense (rather than a Class A misdemeanor) and a Class 3 felony for a fourth or subsequent offense. Effective immediately.
Title
LOST&STOLEN FIREARMS-PENALTY
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Margaret Croke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3144&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3144.htm |