IL HB2505 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In a Section concerning the debt limitations of school districts, provides that, in addition to all other authority to issue bonds, Brookfield LaGrange Park School District Number 95 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $20,000,000 if certain conditions are met, including (1) that the voters of the district approve a proposition for the bond issuance at an election held on or after April 4, 2017 and (2) that, prior to the issuance of the bonds, the school board determines, by resolution, that the additions and renovations to the Brook Park Elementary and S. E. Gross Middle School buildings are required to accommodate enrollment growth, replace outdated facilities, and create spaces consistent with 21st century learning. Provides that the debt incurred on the bonds and on any bonds issued to refund or continue to refund such bonds shall not be considered indebtedness for purposes of any statutory debt limitation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DEBT LIMIT EXCEPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-11-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-11-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-11-28HouseArrived in House
2018-11-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-11-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McGuire
2018-11-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-12-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-09-13SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-08-13SenateSecond Reading
2017-08-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-08-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-13SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As August 14, 2017
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-07-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-07-31SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-07-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-049-001
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-002-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105519-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback