IL HB2286 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Provides that neither the State nor any of its subdivisions may authorize the use of, appropriate, or expend funds to pay for an abortion or to cover any part of the costs of a health plan that includes coverage of abortion or to provide or refer for an abortion, unless a woman who suffers from a physical disorder, physical injury, or physical illness that would, as certified by a physician, place the woman in danger of death if an abortion is not performed. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Excludes from the programs of health benefits and services authorized under those Acts coverage for elective abortions as provided in the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Prohibits a physician who has been found guilty of performing an abortion procedure in a willful and wanton manner upon a woman who was not pregnant when the abortion procedure was performed from participating in the State's Medical Assistance Program. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require a written statement, including the required opinion of a physician, to accompany a claim for reimbursement for abortions or induced miscarriages or premature births. Makes other changes. Amends the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act. Permits the Department of Human Services to make grants to nonprofit agencies and organizations that do not use those grants to refer or counsel for, or perform, abortions. Contains provisions regarding applicability and preempts home rule. Effective June 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO TAXPAYER FUNDING ABORTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-02-27HouseTo Informed Consent Subcommittee
2019-02-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-8Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-9Amended CodeCitation Text
30556-1Amended CodeCitation Text
4102304-100Amended CodeCitation Text
53756Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback