IL HB1697 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004. Removes language allowing an owner of livestock and any of the owner's employees or the owner and employees of a service and care provider of livestock caring for and treating livestock belonging to the owner or under a provider's care to dock cattle, horses, sheep, goats, and swine. Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that no person may dock or hire any other person to dock the tail of any living member of the bovine species. Provides that any person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class C misdemeanor and must pay a fine not to exceed $500. Authorizes licensed veterinarians to dock tails if doing so is necessary to protect the health of the animal. Defines "dock".
Title
ANIMALS--BOVINE TAIL DOCKING
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-30 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-30 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-30 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2012-03-29 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2012-03-27 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2012-03-26 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-26 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-004-000 |
2012-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2012-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-01-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 6, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-003-000 |
2011-04-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2011-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-03-28 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2011-03-28 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 115 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 70 | 3.03-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |