IL HB1690 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section creating the civil administrative agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 36 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-001-000
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-036-003
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2053Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback