IL HB1671 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning rabies inoculations.
Title
ANIMALS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0666 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |