IL HB1442 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Director of Public Health, if a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches in Illinois, shall establish a standing order complete with the issuance of a prescription for a hormonal contraceptive in accordance with the requirements of the provisions. Provides that if the Director is not a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches in Illinois, the Medical Director of the Department of Public Health shall establish the standing order. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan to provide coverage for patient care services provided by a pharmacist. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, and the School Code. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that the definition of "practice of pharmacy" includes the dispensing of hormonal contraceptives pursuant to the standing order under provisions of the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the medical assistance program to cover patient care services provided by a pharmacist for hormonal contraceptives assessment and consultation. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CODE-BIRTH CONTROL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-07-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-006-000
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
2023102310-705New CodeSee Bill Text
2155356z.33New CodeSee Bill Text
225853Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.12cNew CodeSee Bill Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback