IL HB0133 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that any label of fresh, frozen, or processed fish or shellfish, wild or farm raised, offered for sale at wholesale or retail shall clearly identify (1) the species of fish or shellfish by its common name, (2) whether the fish or shellfish was farm raised or wild caught, and (3) whether the fish or shellfish was caught domestically or imported. Provides that a retail food facility that sells or offers for sale any fresh, frozen, or processed fish or shellfish, wild or farm raised, may not knowingly misidentify or misbrand (1) the country of origin of the fish or shellfish or (2) whether the fish or shellfish was farm raised or wild caught. Sets forth provisions concerning misbranding and the presumption of knowledge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD LABELING-SEAFOOD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2015-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2015-03-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-09HouseJudicial Note Filed
2015-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-06HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-03-05HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2015-03-05HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
2015-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2015-03-03HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-007-000
2015-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
2015-02-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2015-02-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-02-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2015-02-03HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2015-01-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41062012.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback