IL HB0693 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health benefit plan or health carrier, including, but not limited to, a preferred provider organization, an independent physician association, a third-party administrator, or any entity that contracts with licensed health care providers shall not impose any fixed co-payment that exceeds 50% of the total billed charges for health care services provided to an insured or enrolled during a visit to a health care provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-COPAYMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.3bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback