IL HB0051 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Peter Mendez Act. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that curriculum for probationary police officers curriculum shall also include specified instruction in trauma-informed responses designed to ensure the physical safety and well-being of a child of an arrested parent or immediate family member.
Title
CD CORR-FINE DEFAULT NOTICE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0224 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2019-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Collins |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-020-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-002-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-9-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |