ID SCR127 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO COMMUNITY FOUNDATION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring the Idaho Community Foundation for its outstanding charitable and philanthropic endeavors and services to the people of Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring the Idaho Community Foundation for its outstanding charitable and philanthropic endeavors and services to the people of Idaho.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-07SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-06Houseto Senate
2018-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-01HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-01HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-01-31Senateto House
2018-01-31SenateTitle apvd
2018-01-31SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-01-30SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback