ID SCR111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- States findings of the Legislature and authorizes the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the state's methodology for funding public school construction and maintenance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

States findings of the Legislature and authorizes the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the state's methodology for funding public school construction and maintenance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseU.C. to be returned to Education Committee
2019-04-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-20HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-03-20HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-19Senateto House
2019-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-19SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 26-7-2
2019-03-18SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback