ID SCR104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: House Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INDUSTRIAL COMMISSION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Industrial Commission relating to Administrative Rules of the Industrial Commission Under the Workers' Compensation Law, Security for Compensation, and Self-Insured Employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Industrial Commission relating to Administrative Rules of the Industrial Commission Under the Workers' Compensation Law, Security for Compensation, and Self-Insured Employers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseRead First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-03-04HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-01Senateto House
2019-03-01SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-01SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-28SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback