ID S1342 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- ATTORNEY GENERAL -- Appropriates $25,312,600 to the Attorney General for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 210.60; and exempts the Attorney General from object and program transfer limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $25,312,600 to the Attorney General for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 210.60; and exempts the Attorney General from object and program transfer limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-13Houseto Senate
2018-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-12-3
2018-03-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-09HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-08Senateto House
2018-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-08SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-08SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-06SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback