ID S1305 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 146 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STOCKWATER -- Amends existing law to provide that for rights to the use of water for in-stream or out-of-stream livestock purposes associated with grazing on federally owned or managed land established under the diversion and application to beneficial use method of appropriation, the water right shall be an appurtenance to the base property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that for rights to the use of water for in-stream or out-of-stream livestock purposes associated with grazing on federally owned or managed land established under the diversion and application to beneficial use method of appropriation, the water right shall be an appurtenance to the base property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateSession Law Chapter 146 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-08Houseto Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-23HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-22Senateto House
2018-02-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-22SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback