ID S1294 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the cigarette tax and the tobacco tax.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the cigarette tax and the tobacco tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4 |
2018-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2018-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |