ID S1080 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 155 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 155 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VETERANS -- Amends existing law to provide that interest generated by moneys in the Idaho Veterans Recognition Income Fund shall be maintained by the Division of Veterans Services.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that interest generated by moneys in the Idaho Veterans Recognition Income Fund shall be maintained by the Division of Veterans Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 155 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 60-0-10 |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-03-04 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |