ID S1006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Session Law Chapter 260 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

UNIFORM SECURITIES ACT -- Amends existing law to revise the requirements for notice filings for certain federal covered securities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the requirements for notice filings for certain federal covered securities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSession Law Chapter 260 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-29SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-28HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-27SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-26Houseto Senate
2019-03-26HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2019-03-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-21Senateto House
2019-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-18SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback