ID H0113 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 177 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adds to existing law relating to actions in particular cases to provide for the Idaho Agritourism Promotion Act, to provide for certain limitations on liability relating to agritourism, to require warning notices and to provide that the use of a farm or ranch for agritourism activities shall not affect the assessment of the property as land actively devoted to agriculture as provided by specified law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law relating to actions in particular cases to provide for the Idaho Agritourism Promotion Act, to provide for certain limitations on liability relating to agritourism, to require warning notices and to provide that the use of a farm or ranch for agritourism activities shall not affect the assessment of the property as land actively devoted to agriculture as provided by specified law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-29HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 177 Effective: 07/01/13
2013-03-26HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on March 25, 2013
2013-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2013-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2013-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2013-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2013-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2013-03-19Senateto House
2013-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-19SenatePASSED -- 34-1-0
2013-03-19SenateRead third time in full
2013-03-18SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-03-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
2013-03-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2013-03-07Houseto Senate
2013-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-07HouseBolz
2013-03-07House69-1-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Burgoyne Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor
2013-03-07HousePASSED
2013-03-07HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times
2013-03-07HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-06HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2013-03-06HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2013-03-05HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2013-03-05HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2013-03-05HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2013-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2013-02-21HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2013-02-08HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2013-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback