ID H0562 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2018 with contingency
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PUBLIC HEALTH DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the district Boards of Health and the Board of Trustees of the district Boards of Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the district Boards of Health and the Board of Trustees of the district Boards of Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2018 with contingency
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22Houseto enrol
2018-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-22HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-22HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-21HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-20HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-20HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2018-03-16HouseReferred to Health & Welfare for concurrence recommendation
2018-03-16HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2018-03-15Senateto House
2018-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-15SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-15SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-15SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-14SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-03-14SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-03-14SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-13SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2018-03-12SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-09SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2018-02-28SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-27Houseto Senate
2018-02-27HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 62-6-2
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback