ID H0493 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 45 Effective: 03/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE CONTROLLER -- Adds to existing law to authorize the State Controller's business information infrastructure project to create a leadership council and to provide funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to authorize the State Controller's business information infrastructure project to create a leadership council and to provide funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 45 Effective: 03/07/2018
2018-03-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 1, 2018
2018-03-01HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-02-28SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-02-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-02-26HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-02-23Senateto House
2018-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-02-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-12Houseto Senate
2018-02-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-13-1
2018-02-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2018
2018-02-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-06HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback