ID H0170 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHILD PROTECTION -- Adds to existing law to require a notification of rights to parents or other concerned persons during an investigation of child abuse, neglect, or abandonment.
Title
Adds to existing law to require a notification of rights to parents or other concerned persons during an investigation of child abuse, neglect, or abandonment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-23-3 |
2019-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |