ID H0038 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 27 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FOOD SAFETY MODERNIZATION ACT -- Amends existing law to revise a date by which certain contracts and contracting authority shall transition to the Idaho State Department of Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise a date by which certain contracts and contracting authority shall transition to the Idaho State Department of Agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 27 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-02-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on February 18, 2019
2019-02-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-12Senateto House
2019-02-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
2019-02-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-31Houseto Senate
2019-01-31HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-31HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-29HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-24HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback