IA SF2172 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to management of swine, including by providing for biosecurity and development in a farrowing and gestating operation which is part of a confinement feeding operation, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2022.) Effective 7-1-12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to management of swine, including by providing for biosecurity and development in a farrowing and gestating operation which is part of a confinement feeding operation, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2022.) Effective 7-1-12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-30 Signed by Governor. S.J. 700.
2012-03-27 Sent to Governor. S.J. 673.
2012-03-27 Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 673.
2012-03-21 Message from House. S.J. 612.
2012-03-20 Immediate message. H.J. 597.
2012-03-20 Passed House, ayes 91, nays 3. H.J. 593.
2012-03-12 Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 517.
2012-03-01 Subcommittee, Deyoe, Hein, and H. Miller. H.J. 406.
2012-02-29 Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 381.
2012-02-28 Message from Senate. H.J. 358.
2012-02-28 Immediate message. S.J. 390.
2012-02-28 Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 1. S.J. 386.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-5019 adopted. S.J. 386.
2012-02-20 Amendment S-5019 filed. S.J. 295.
2012-02-13 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 237.
2012-02-13 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 235.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback