GA SR448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Georgia-North Carolina and Georgia-Tennessee Boundary Line Commission; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Georgia-North Carolina and Georgia-Tennessee Boundary Line Commission; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback