GA SB427 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 10 and 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commerce and trade and food, drugs, and cosmetics, respectively, so as to provide for disclosure requirements for advertisements for legal services and for drugs; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce and Trade; disclosure requirements for advertisements for legal services and for drugs; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #539 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Adoption Of The Amendment By The Sen From The 50th As Amended: Senate Vote #538 (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #529 (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Adoption Of The Amendment By The Sen From The 50th As Amended: Senate Vote #538 (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #529 (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |