GA SB319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact the "Consolidation of Fire Safety Services in Georgia Act"; to establish the Department of Fire Safety; to amend Titles 8, 10, 16, 25, 30, 35, 42, 43, 45, 50 of the O.C.G.A, ; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Consolidation of Fire Safety Services in Georgia Act"; enact; Department of Fire Safety; establish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #788 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #482 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-23HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback