GA SB317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 485
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from Fulton County school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Exemption; Fulton County school district; ad valorem taxes for educational purposes; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #586 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #626 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #499 (Y: 54 N: 101 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #394 (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 485
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-07SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
2018-02-15HouseHouse Reconsidered
2018-02-14HouseHouse Notice to Reconsider
2018-02-14HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2018-02-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-19HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-01-11SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-09SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback