GA SB168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to child abuse, so as to extend the persons and agencies permitted to access child abuse records by the department or a county or other state or local agency; to amend Article 8 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Central Child Abuse Registry, so as to permit access to information in the child abuse registry to certain governmental entities investigating allegations of child abuse; to permit access to child abuse registry to certain child-placing entities conducting foster and adoptive parent background checks; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Abuse; permitted to access child abuse records by department, or county, or other state or local agency; extend; Central Child Abuse Registry; permit access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #334 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #320 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #104 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 170
2017-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback