GA HR610 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to remove election and voting systems from the critical infrastructure designation; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Congress; remove election and voting systems from the critical infrastructure designation; urge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-15HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback