GA HR30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for the local authorization of a limited number of licensed destination resort facilities casino resorts within the state; to authorize the operation and regulation of limited casino gaming within the state; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; provide by law for local authorization of a limited number of licensed destination resort facilities casino resorts within the state; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58966 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/195884 |