GA HR26 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION compensating Kenneth Eric Gardiner; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gardiner, Kenneth Eric; compensate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #278 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Adopt: House Vote #204 (Y: 150 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Effective Date
2021-05-10 Act 295
2021-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback