GA HB779 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the O.C.G.A., relating to emergency management, so as to establish the homeland security division of the Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency; to amend Code Section 16-11-130 of the O.C.G.A., relating to exemptions from Code Sections 16-11-126 through 16-11-127.2, so as to authorize any officer or agent or retired officer or agent of such division to carry a handgun on or off duty within this state with an exception; to amend Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Bureau of Investigation, so as to revise the duties of the director of the Georgia Bureau of Investigation pertaining to the Georgia Information Sharing and Analysis Center; to revise the duties of the Georgia Information Sharing and Analysis Center; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency management; homeland security division; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #882 (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #649 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #618 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 435
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback