GA HB735 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, and computation of and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to create an income tax credit for expenditures on the maintenance of railroad track owned or leased by a Class III railroad; to provide for rules and regulations related to such income tax credit; to provide for certain conditions and limitations; to require annual reporting of certain statistics related to such credit; to provide for definitions; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit; expenditures on the maintenance of a railroad track owned or leased by a Class III railroad; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #798 (Y: 160 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #670 (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #529 (Y: 172 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 476
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-27HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-23SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-21SenateSenate Recommitted
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback