GA HB514 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to governing and regulation of mental health, so as to create the Georgia Mental Health Reform and Innovation Commission; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for a definition; to provide for members and officers; to provide for meetings, agendas, quorum, and compensation; to provide for the commission's duties and powers; to provide for subcommittees; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Mental Health Reform and Innovation Commission; create
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #381 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #346 (Y: 150 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #208 (Y: 152 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #346 (Y: 150 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #208 (Y: 152 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 216 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |