GA HB282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 13 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of qualified timberland property, so as to add a definition; to limit the determination of fair market value to a weighted market and income approach to valuation; to revise certain requirements for certification of qualified timberland property; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem tax; qualified timberland property; add a definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #377 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #354 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 32, Hb 282, Hb 317, Hb 477, Hb 517, & Hb 587: Senate Vote #298 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #54 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2021-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-29SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-17HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-17HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-04HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-03HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback