GA HB2 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 9-3-33.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to actions for childhood sexual abuse, so as to change provisions relating to the revival of certain claims; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Childhood sexual abuse; revival of certain claims; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |
2016-11-15 | House | House Prefiled |