GA HB186 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county and municipal hospital authorities, so as to revise provisions relating to the sale or lease of a hospital by a hospital authority; to provide for conflicting interest transactions; to provide for the investment of funds by certain hospital authorities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; sale or lease of a hospital by a hospital authority; revise provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #341 (Y: 170 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #230 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #54 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-25 Act 41
2019-04-25HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-25SenateSenate Transmitted House
2019-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-25SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-22SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback