GA HB1192 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use tax, so as to prohibit the issuance of new certificates of exemption for certain high-technology data center equipment; to revise the new quality job requirement for such exemption; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; certain high-technology data center equipment; prohibit issuance of new certificates of exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #667 (Y: 29 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #666 (Y: 21 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #660 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider: Senate Vote #659 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #658 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #580 (Y: 96 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #666 (Y: 21 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #660 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider: Senate Vote #659 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #658 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #580 (Y: 96 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Veto V7 | |
2024-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Hopper |