GA HB1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 33 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the scholarship program for special needs students, so as to revise the name of the scholarship; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Senator Eric Johnson Scholarship Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] |
Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2018-11-15 | House | House Prefiled |